THE ROYAL NAVAL AND MILITARY SCHOOLS ENDOWMENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES FOR HIGHER EDUCATION AND APPRENTICESHIPS FOR SONS AND DAUGHTERS OF SEAMEN, MARINERS, FISHERMEN, WATERMEN OR PENSIONED OR RETIRED SOLDIERS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 24 August 1962: Standard registration
- 06 September 2011: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 06 September 2011: Funds transferred to 1137876 PLYMOUTH ASPIRATIONS TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.26k | £1.34k | £3.63k | £1.93k | £237 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 22 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 10 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 16 July 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 9TH JUNE 1915
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN PLYMOUTH IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT. 1) AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS OR SUCH OTHER ASSISTANCE AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. 2) PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC, OTHER ARTS OR SPORT) TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATION ESTABLISHMENT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF DEVONPORT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window