STOCKLAND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 306817
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Use of investment income in support of people living in Stockland parish.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £465
Total expenditure: £350

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MONICA JEAN PARRIS Chair
Stockland Victory Hall
Received: On time
STOCKLAND PARISH LANDS (GENERAL) CHARITY
Received: On time
Anna Marguerite Trott Trustee 14 March 2024
STOCKLAND PARISH LANDS (GENERAL) CHARITY
Received: On time
Jane Clare Bright Trustee 23 March 2022
STOCKLAND PARISH LANDS (GENERAL) CHARITY
Received: On time
BRYAN DREW Trustee 01 June 2019
None on record
David Urquhart Trustee 10 April 2017
STOCKLAND PARISH LANDS (GENERAL) CHARITY
Received: On time
JULIE ANITA DOBLE Trustee
STOCKLAND PARISH LANDS (GENERAL) CHARITY
Received: On time
BARBARA DURRANT Trustee
STOCKLAND PARISH LANDS (GENERAL) CHARITY
Received: On time
MRS ANNIE WILLIAMS Trustee
STOCKLAND PARISH LANDS (GENERAL) CHARITY
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS STOCKLAND
Received: On time
Stockland Victory Hall
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £248 £252 £458 £464 £465
Total expenditure £330 £0 £500 £320 £350
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Middle March
Stockland
Honiton
EX14 9EF
Phone:
01404881644
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available