Accounts and annual returns REVEREND JAMES HOW

Charity Number: 306849
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 13 April 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 03 March 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 27 April 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 17 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 28 February 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required