SUNDAY SCHOOL AND SCHOOL OF INDUSTRY (OTHERWISE HOUSEHOLD OF FAITH)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children's activities for St Matthias Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 23 August 1962: Standard registration
- 08 December 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 08 December 2023: Funds transferred to 1134139 PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PAR...
No other names
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £904 | £923 | £941 | £960 | £979 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £870 | £2.40k | £0 | £1.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 January 2021 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 20TH DECEMBER 1966
Charitable objects
THE NET YEARLY INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES IN PROMOTING EDUCATION OF PERSONS NOT EXCEEDING THE AGE OF 25 YEARS, RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND BY MEANS OF A SUNDAY SCHOOL OR OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CHARLES WITH ST MATTHAIS PLYMOUTH AND NEIGHBOURHOO
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window