Financial history CHURCH OF ENGLAND SUNDAY SCHOOL

Charity number: 306871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.01k £6.60k £6.64k £6.66k £7.03k
Total expenditure £6.08k £4.64k £10.53k £2.51k £6.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A