CHURCH OF ENGLAND SUNDAY SCHOOL

Charity number: 306871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Religious Education of Children and Young People and others in the Parish of Welcombe

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £7,029
Total expenditure: £6,170

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 June 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHURCH COTTAGE (Working name)
  • WELCOMBE CHURCH COTTAGE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Jane Mary Skinner Trustee 17 April 2020
CHARITY OF JANE MARIANNE ELWES FOR SICK POOR
Received: On time
THE HARTLAND CHARITY
Received: On time
HELEN MARY BENCE Trustee 31 March 2013
None on record
SHEILA MARY WADE Trustee
WELCOMBE VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
HOWARD MARTIN PANKHURST Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.01k £6.60k £6.64k £6.66k £7.03k
Total expenditure £6.08k £4.64k £10.53k £2.51k £6.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 07 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
UPCOTT BARN
WELCOMBE
BIDEFORD
EX39 6HE
Phone:
01288331273
Website:

No information available