DAME HANNAH ROGER'S SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY EXISTS FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS WITH A RANGE OF DISABILITIES THROUGH OUR SCHOOL, CHILDREN'S HOME, YOUNG ADULT TRANSITION PROJECT, ACCOMMODATION, ACTIVITIES AS WELL AS OPPORTUNITIES FOR ENTERPRISE AND SOCIAL / EMOTIONAL SUPPORT. WE ALSO PROVIDE ASSESSMENTS, TRAINING, SUPPORT AND ADVISORY SERVICES THROUGH OUR HIGHLY SKILLED STAFF AND EXCELLENT FACILITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Isle Of Anglesey
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 October 1962: Standard registration
- 01 April 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DAME HANNAH ROGERS TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dame Hannah Rogers Trust 2019 Limited | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.89m | £6.42m | £1.73m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.23m | £6.02m | £1.67m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £7.15m | £5.73m | £1.67m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £35.38k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £176.01k | £275.54k | £29.44k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £563.93k | £411.90k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £7.15m | £5.73m | £1.70m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £39 | £14 | £1 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £61.78k | £108.62k | £5.60k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.96m | £5.73m | £1.66m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £268.07k | £283.87k | £7.87k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £288.68k | £130.29k | £38.18k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £54 | £9.98k | £5.57k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 03 MAY 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (1)THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF DISABILITY, BY THE INCLUSIVE PROVISION OF CARE, ADVOCACY, INTEGRATION, LEARNING, TRAINING AND OTHER SUPPORT SERVICES WITH A PREFERENCE GIVEN TO THOSE WHO ARE, OR WHOSE PARENTS OR GUARDIANS ARE, RESIDENT IN DEVON OR CORNWALL; (2)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND UNDERSTANDING RELATING TO THE CARE, TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT OF PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES AND THEIR INTEGRATION INTO WIDER SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: (A)THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE FAMILIES,CARERS AND ASSOCIATED PROFESSIONALS OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES SUPPORTED BY THE CHARITY IN ORDER TO HELP DEVELOP THEIR INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCIES, AND SKILLS; AND (B)THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES TO THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING PROMOTING RESEARCH AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 01 October 1962 : Standard registration
- 01 April 2021 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
DAME HANNAHS
WOODLAND ROAD
IVYBRIDGE
PL21 9HQ
- Phone:
- 01752 892461
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window