THE EUROPEAN-ATLANTIC MOVEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TEAM is an independent educational foundation which aims to promote an understanding and discussion of world affairs and the institutions of international cooperation. It does so by arranging conferences for sixth form and other students at schools and universities and organising study tours for schools and teachers. See www.european-atlantic.org.uk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 February 1965: Standard registration
- TEAM (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAURENCE ARTHUR SMY MA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Richard Graeme Titmas | Trustee | 18 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL NORMAN MITCHELL | Trustee | 29 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD FERNAND HILLEBRAND | Trustee | 29 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN B WILSON | Trustee | 29 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN MCSHARRY BA | Trustee | 29 June 2012 |
|
|||||
ANTONY JOLYON FROST B SC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN RICHARD COLLIS BA ACIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.19k | £2.24k | £8.59k | £3.92k | £5.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.78k | £5.61k | £7.13k | £6.31k | £8.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 August 2022 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 30TH SEPTEMBER 1964
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE RESEARCH BY THE STAFFS AND STUDENTS AT UNIVERSITIES AND TEACHER TRAINING COLLEGES IN WESTERN EUROPE AND THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AND CANADA AND TO DISSEMINATE INFORMATION ABOUT THE SOCIAL ECONOMICS AND CONSTTITUTIONAL DEVELOPMENT OF THE EUROPEAN AND ATLANTIC COMMUNITIES AND THEIR INSTITUTIONS TO TEACHER TRAINING COLLEGES AND SCHOOLS IN WESTERN EUROPE THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AND CANADA.
Area of benefit
WESTERN EUROPE,UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AND CANADA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
70 CARLTON HILL
LONDON
NW8 0ET
- Phone:
- 02076248940
- Email:
- europeanatlantic@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window