RIKKYO SCHOOL IN ENGLAND TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND THE HOLY CATHOLIC CHURCH OF JAPAN OF BOYS AND GIRLS AGED 10 TO 18 TO THE STANDARDS REQUIRED FOR ENTRY INTO UNIVERSITIES IN JAPAN, WHILST TAKING ADVANTAGE OF THE UNIQUE GEOGRAPHICAL LOCATION OF THE SCHOOL THROUGH EXTRA-CURRICULAR ACTIVITIES, BOTH ACADEMIC AND SPORTING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£6,936,460
Donations and legacies | £91.77k | |
Charitable activities | £6.49m | |
Other trading activities | £245.08k | |
Investments | £105.90k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£6,361,096
Raising funds | £205.27k | |
Charitable activities | £6.16m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £205.27k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.16m | |
Retained for future use | £575.36k |
People

95 Employee(s)
23 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 5 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 07 December 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Junichi Sugiyama | Chair | 02 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hidefumi Yamamura | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Satoru Ichinokawa | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shinichi Yoshihara | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tung-Fu Wu | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jun Otake | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Shuichi Kato | Trustee | 10 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yasuo Kashiwagi | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hiroyuki Koike | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hiroaki Fukuda | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hiroyuki Takahashi | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kenji Kawate | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daisuke Mototani | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Seiya Iwanaga | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Renta Nishihara | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Makiko Osawa | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Yukio Toyoda | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Toru Okano | Trustee | 10 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Takuya Okuno | Trustee | 10 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Naoaki Kobayashi | Trustee | 12 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
HIROMI BUNDAY | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROGER MINORU MUNECHIKA BSC MSC | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
KOICHIRO NAKADA | Trustee | 01 December 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.98m | £5.12m | £5.79m | £6.47m | £6.94m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.82m | £4.54m | £5.13m | £5.28m | £6.36m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £169.78k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £41.64k | £111.04k | £178.93k | £182.45k | £91.77k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £27.92k | £224.81k | £98.88k | £122.43k | £245.08k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.90m | £4.78m | £5.51m | £6.11m | £6.49m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £14.36k | £3.53k | £617 | £58.74k | £105.90k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.82m | £4.54m | £5.13m | £5.06m | £6.16m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £223.42k | £205.27k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £18.00k | £22.50k | £23.27k | £21.28k | £57.08k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £8.15m | £7.95m | £7.72m | £7.92m | £8.58m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £6.77m | £7.30m | £7.96m | £8.97m | £7.98m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £6.78m | £6.72m | £6.64m | £6.61m | £5.71m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 March 2025 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
06 March 2025 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20TH OCTOBER 1971 AS AMENDED 5TH APRIL 1972 AND 11TH MAY 1983 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25 NOV 2019 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30 MAY 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS IN ENGLAND AND TO SUPPORT EXPAND AND DEVELOP THE SAME FINANCIALLY AND OTHERWISE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND IN HARMONY WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND THE HOLY CATHOLIC CHURCH OF JAPAN. THE TRUSTEES MAY PROVIDE PLACES AT THE SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR CHILDREN AND OTHERS NOT ADHERING TO SUCH PRINCIPLES AND DOCTRINES IF THEY SHALL SO DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE RIKKYO SCHOOL IN ENGLAND
GUILDFORD ROAD
RUDGWICK
HORSHAM
RH12 3BE
- Phone:
- 01403822107
- Email:
- eikoku@rikkyo.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window