Financial history MICHAEL HALL SCHOOL

Charity number: 307006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £4.05m £3.79m £3.39m £4.09m £4.81m
Total expenditure £4.74m £3.90m £3.54m £4.00m £4.42m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £501.94k £354.62k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.20k £31.26k £2.83k £21.71k £8.41k
Income - Other trading activities £136.59k £137.13k £171.35k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.42m £3.07m £3.21m £3.90m £4.65m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14.95k £8.62k £10.21k £10.05k £10.41k
Income - Other £471.64k £540.90k £0 £151.50k £148.34k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £21.71k £8.41k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.63m £3.72m £3.50m £3.97m £4.39m
Expenditure - Raising funds £111.85k £178.64k £37.04k £34.88k £33.19k
Expenditure - Governance £30.41k £19.90k £19.90k £19.90k £20.38k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0