THE COLLYER ENDOWMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal object of the Charity is the promotion of education, with preference to the College, through awarding scholarships, exhibitions or bursaries to individuals and in other ways for which provision is not made out of public funds, for example, the provision of educational buildings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Sussex
Governance
- 17 September 1963: Standard registration
- 25 November 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- COLLYER'S SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY FRANCIS BOWLEY | Chair | 01 November 2015 |
|
|||||||
Miranda Jane Davies | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|||||||
Claudine Vickery | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|||||||
Edward Walter Rollet Bridges | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|||||||
GRAHAM NEIL LAWRENCE | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|||||||
Dr David Gordon Skipp | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.02k | £67.86k | £53.51k | £46.33k | £73.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £227.17k | £77.93k | £283.99k | £299.17k | £93.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 19 DEC 1994 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 27 NOV 2015 as amended on 13 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
The object of the Charity is to advance education for the public benefit by: i. providing land and buildings for the College; and ii. providing financial or other support, in particular but not exclusively by: (a) promoting education at the College in ways for which provision is not made out of public funds; (b) promoting the education (including social and physical training) of persons under the age of 25 years who are attending or who have attended the College; and (c) promoting the education (including social and physical training) of persons under the age of 25 years who are resident in the County of West Sussex with a preference for persons qualified as aforesaid who are resident in the area of the District of Horsham. ?College? means The College of Richard Collyer in Horsham, a Designated Institution within the meaning of the Further and Higher Education Act 1992 or as a 16 to 19 academy or a school within the meaning of the Education Acts (including an academy). The charity?s proposed purposes in respect of the capital held as permanent endowment The Trustees shall permit the land and buildings of the College to be appropriated and used for the purposes of the College.
Area of benefit
HORSHAM AND DISTRICT.
Linked charities
- 17 September 1963 : Standard registration
- 25 November 2011 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
COLLYERS SIXTH FORM COLLEGE
82 HURST ROAD
HORSHAM
WEST SUSSEX
RH12 2EJ
- Phone:
- 01403216506
- Email:
- ifd@collyers.ac.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window