THE MALDEN TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Charity is to benefit the public via Windlesham House School, a preparatory boarding School for boys and girls between the ages of 4 and 13, to ensure that our unique approach to education is made available to as many children as possible through bursaries, for which we maintain a fund, and partnership with, and support to, maintained schools and other educational institutions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£9,017,850
Donations and legacies | £77.30k | |
Charitable activities | £8.79m | |
Other trading activities | £34.16k | |
Investments | £115.82k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£9,060,945
Raising funds | £3.14k | |
Charitable activities | £9.06m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.14k | |
Charitable expenditure | £9.06m |
People

151 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 23 May 1963: Standard registration
- LITTLE WINDLESHAM (Working name)
- WINDLESHAM HOUSE SCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martina Asmar | Chair | 09 March 2015 |
|
|||||
Michael Crawford | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Ives | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Marriott | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Perry | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Michael John Hinton | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Johnston Mrs | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Kerr-Dineen | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
David Armitage | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.29m | £5.80m | £7.33m | £8.31m | £9.02m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.72m | £6.96m | £7.56m | £8.70m | £9.06m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £468.83k | £194.78k | £29.38k | £45.25k | £77.30k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £38.96k | £49.35k | £44.53k | £34.16k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £6.82m | £5.57m | £6.85m | £8.15m | £8.79m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.87k | £665 | £3.92k | £70.16k | £115.82k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £403.92k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.56m | £6.85m | £7.42m | £8.69m | £9.06m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £158.17k | £105.43k | £143.72k | £1.69k | £3.14k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £93.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £781 | £781 | £194 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £14.19m | £13.51m | £12.94m | £12.41m | £12.04m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1 | £1 | £1 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.53m | £1.19m | £1.93m | £2.53m | £3.35m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £7.01m | £7.15m | £7.54m | £8.00m | £8.49m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 JANUARY 1963 AS AMENDED 17 MARCH 2003, 22 NOVEMBER 2004 AND 16 NOVEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
(I) TO ACQUIRE AND TAKE OVER AND CARRY ON AND DEVELOP THE SCHOOL UNDERTAKING OF WINDLESHAM HOUSE SCHOOL LIMITED AND ALL SUCH ASSETS AND LIABILITIES OF THAT COMPANY AS MAY LAWFULLY BE ACQUIRED AND TAKEN OVER BY THE TRUST. (2) TO ACQUIRE AND CARRY ON IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ANY OTHER SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WINDLESHAM HOUSE SCHOOL
LONDON ROAD
WASHINGTON
PULBOROUGH
RH20 4AY
- Phone:
- 01903874705
- Email:
- eharris@windlesham.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window