Financial history BRIGHTON COLLEGE

Charity number: 307061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £54.25m £53.93m £64.87m £69.04m £74.11m
Total expenditure £46.85m £46.80m £54.73m £60.17m £64.20m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £779.97k £436.96k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.68m £1.29m £3.55m £2.19m £2.23m
Income - Other trading activities £894.00k £522.59k £1.07m £1.11m £1.04m
Income - Charitable activities £51.60m £52.04m £60.02m £65.11m £70.06m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £79.00k £69.15k £236.01k £632.22k £781.26k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £45.79m £46.39m £54.14m £59.08m £63.42m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.06m £412.30k £585.92k £1.09m £783.11k
Expenditure - Governance £37.00k £37.72k £19.61k £42.88k £54.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £135.88k £108.78k £181.82k £217.16k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0