BRIGHTON COLLEGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a first class independent education for children between the ages of 3 to 18. Subject to donations and budgetary limits, scholarship awards are made on the basis of the individual's educational potential and bursary awards are made to enable academically able children to benefit where financial hardship might otherwise preclude.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£69,043,246
Donations and legacies | £2.19m | |
Charitable activities | £65.11m | |
Other trading activities | £1.11m | |
Investments | £632.22k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£60,168,636
Raising funds | £1.09m | |
Charitable activities | £59.08m | |
Other | £0 |
£448,671 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.09m | |
Charitable expenditure | £59.08m | |
Retained for future use | £8.87m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.09m | |
Charitable expenditure | £59.08m | |
Retained for future use | £9.32m |
People

800 Employee(s)
16 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 27 |
£70k to £80k | 13 |
£80k to £90k | 8 |
£90k to £100k | 5 |
£100k to £110k | 8 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
£130k to £140k | 2 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 4 |
£250k to £300k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 19 May 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alex Wagenberg | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Gibson | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Christopher Andrew Bushell | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Andrew Underwood | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Byrne | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christina Jane Maude | Trustee | 08 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Hannington FRICS FSA | Trustee | 11 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Thomas Cayley CMG QC | Trustee | 25 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Martina Asmar | Trustee | 05 December 2015 |
|
|||||
Miles Templeman | Trustee | 05 December 2015 |
|
|||||
Richard Thomas Ricci | Trustee | 06 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN STUART WEIR FCA, BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Joan Deslandes | Trustee |
|
||||||
ADAM PETTITT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
The Right Hon. Lord Francis Maude of Horsham | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM HENRY PETER JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.12m | £54.25m | £53.93m | £64.87m | £69.04m | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.78m | £46.85m | £46.80m | £54.73m | £60.17m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £779.97k | £436.96k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.55m | £1.68m | £1.29m | £3.55m | £2.19m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.35m | £894.00k | £522.59k | £1.07m | £1.11m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £51.05m | £51.60m | £52.04m | £60.02m | £65.11m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £174.00k | £79.00k | £69.15k | £236.01k | £632.22k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £42.65m | £45.79m | £46.39m | £54.14m | £59.08m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.13m | £1.06m | £412.30k | £585.92k | £1.09m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £55.00k | £37.00k | £37.72k | £19.61k | £42.88k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £135.88k | £108.78k | £181.82k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £106.28m | £113.02m | £112.78m | £117.10m | £130.44m | |
|
Long-term investments | £9.31m | £10.31m | £13.48m | £16.48m | £19.78m | |
|
Other assets | £14.78m | £25.22m | £32.60m | £26.22m | £19.73m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£816.00k | -£889.00k | -£666.40k | -£679.40k | -£469.40k | |
|
Total liabilities | £24.99m | £35.73m | £36.93m | £27.81m | £28.23m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 SEP 1873 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 MAR 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 DEC 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 JUN 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 APR 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 OCT 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 NOV 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 APR 2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 MAR 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 JUN 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A SOUND RELIGIOUS, CLASSICAL, MATHEMATICAL AND GENERAL EDUCATION, IN CONFORMITY WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 19 May 2003 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
EASTERN ROAD
BRIGHTON
BN2 0AL
- Phone:
- 01273704200
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window