RINGWOOD UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 307094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The prime object of Ringwood United Charities is the provision of almshouses.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £41,230
Total expenditure: £93,929

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 July 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Stephen David Miles Trustee 25 October 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, RINGWOOD
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, ST LEONARDS AND ST IVES
Received: On time
Mary DeBoos Trustee 16 July 2024
None on record
Jacqueline Clare Brown B A Hons Trustee 12 December 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, RINGWOOD
Received: On time
EDNA ROSE THOMAS LEGACY FOR ST JOHN'S CHURCH, POULNER
Received: On time
David Victor Brown Trustee 15 July 2014
None on record
Kevin Paul Jones B A MCIAT Trustee 12 December 2011
None on record
MR J D HERON Trustee
POULNER INFANT SCHOOL NURSERY TRUST
Received: On time
MR W S RIPPON-SWAINE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £34.76k £37.15k £32.49k £40.17k £41.23k
Total expenditure £69.50k £37.53k £67.12k £84.48k £93.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £510 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 April 2022 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 April 2022 73 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 10 FEBRUARY 1959
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE ALMSHOUSE BRANCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE OF THE CHARITIES OR ANY OF THEM IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF RINGWOOD
Registration history
  • 29 July 2004 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
28 Christchurch Road
Ringwood
Hampshire
BH24 1DN
Phone:
07801473131
Website:

No information available