OATES MEMORIAL LIBRARY AND MUSEUM AND THE GILBERT WHITE MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of the educational charitable trust are to maintain Gilbert White's House & Garden in Selborne, with associated Field Studies Centre, as a visitor attraction & Accredited museum. We engage with people of all ages & abilities to promote enjoyment & exploration of our heritage through our exhibitions, collections, learning & education programme, outreach & access policies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 18 May 1962: Standard registration
- GILBERT WHITE'S HOUSE & THE OATES MUSEUM (Working name)
- GILBERT WHITES HOUSE AND THE OATES MUSEUM (Working name)
- THE OATES MEMORIAL LIBRARY AND MUSEUM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILBERT WHITE & THE OATES COLLECTIONS | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £839 | £162 | £50 | £11.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.73k | £839 | £19.31k | £19.30k | £20.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 07/02/1994 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 11/08/2006 AS AMENDED ON 01/02/2007 AS AMENDED ON 30/03/2009 AS AMENDED ON 08/03/2016 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21/03/2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, (A) BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM AND LIBRARY; AND (B) BY THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF: (I) THE HOUSE KNOWN AS “THE WAKES” IN SELBORNE, HAMPSHIRE TOGETHER WITH ITS ANCILLARY BUILDINGS, GARDENS AND PARK OR SUCH PARTS THEREOF AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE HELD BY THE CHARITY; AND (II) THE GILBERT WHITE AND CAPTAIN LAWRENCE AND FRANK OATES’ COLLECTIONS OF NATURAL HISTORY AND OTHER EXHIBITS, BOOKS AND MANUSCRIPTS; (2) THE SAID LAND AND BUILDINGS AND THE COLLECTION OF EXHIBITS, BOOKS AND MANUSCRIPTS REFERRED TO IN THE SAID SCHEDULE SHALL BE APPROPRIATED AND USED FOR THE SAID OBJECT.
Area of benefit
SELBORNE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gilbert Whites House & Gardens
High Street
Selborne
Alton
GU34 3JH
- Phone:
- 01420511275
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window