RESIDENCE FOR HEAD TEACHER OF CHURCH OF ENGLAND VOLUNTARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manages a house in Grayshott, divided into two flats which are let. The surplus income is used to support Grayshott Church of England Primary School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 13 December 1962: Standard registration
- FIRCROFT (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jeremy William Haswell | Chair | 30 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Austin | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr EDWARD TOBIN | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.69k | £19.17k | £18.31k | £19.02k | £21.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.18k | £31.88k | £15.85k | £5.64k | £14.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 31ST DECEMBER 1930
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF A RESIDENCE FOR THE HEAD TEACHER OF GRAYSHOTT CHURCH OF ENGLAND VOLUNTARY SCHOOL, UNTIL SUCH TIME AS THE GRAYSHOTT SCHOOL CEASES TO BE A VOLUNTARY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GRAYSHOTT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Downleas
Crossways Road
Grayshott
Hindhead
GU26 6HE
- Phone:
- 01428609135
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window