MRS CATHERINE EDWARDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Young people from King's Somborne continuing in education or training after secondary schools apply for and are awarded grants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Hampshire
Governance
- 18 April 1963: Standard registration
- THE CATHERINE EDWARDS TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Bevan | Trustee | 17 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS MANDY MOLESWORTH ST AUBYN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £347 | £299 | £350 | £460 | £385 | |
|
Total expenditure | £368 | £71 | £160 | £600 | £600 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 29TH MARCH 1935
Charitable objects
FURTHERANCE OF THE EDUCATION OF POORER CHILDREN AT INSTITUTIONS OF EDUCATION OTHER THAN ELEMENTARY, BY MEANS OF PAYMENT OF FEES, TRAVELLING EXPENSES, OR OTHERWISE, AND MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES. OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF POORER CHILDREN IN THE PARISH
Area of benefit
PARISH OF KINGS SOMBORNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Seven Barrows
Spitfire Lane
Chattis Hill
Stockbridge
SO20 6JS
- Phone:
- 07769682696
- Email:
- davidbevan50@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window