NATIONAL SCHOOL WITH MARY TOUCHET'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An educational charity for the benefit of residents of the parishes of West Meon and Warnford in Hampshire, governed by a scheme of 1961 set up by the Minister of Education, amended in 1997. Working within that it continues to support the work of West Meon Primary School with a significant annual grant. Individual grants are made with no upper age limit to support all areas of further education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 30 April 1963: Standard registration
- TOUCHET TRUST (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Malcolm Wallace | Trustee | 30 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Antony Forrest | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
JANE WALLER | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|||||
JEREMY BARBER | Trustee | 02 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Shaw | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.94k | £32.58k | £34.27k | £35.40k | £37.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.14k | £27.77k | £30.04k | £28.50k | £32.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 17TH MAY 1961 AS VARIED BY SCHEME SEALED 3 OCTOBER 1997
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY SUCH YEARLY SUM AS THEY THINK FIT BEING NOT MORE THAN ONE THIRD OF THE SAID INCOME IN PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR THE SCHOOL OF THE FOUNDATION AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED UPON BETWEEN THE AUTHORITY AND THE TRUSTEES(A) AWARDING TO BENEFICIARIES EXHIBITIONS TENABLE AT ANY SECONDARY SCHOOL, TRAINING COLLEGE FOR TEACHERS, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER EDUCATION (B) PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS (C) OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING AND RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND BY MEANS OF A SUNDAY SCHOOL OR OTHERWISE OF BENEFICIARIES
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF WEST MEON
Contact information
- Address:
-
BROADVIEW
WEST MEON
PETERSFIELD
GU32 1JZ
- Phone:
- 01730829253
- Email:
- barbara@cgshaw.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window