THE FORUM TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of the landmark Forum building. Staging of events for the public as well as being a venue for other organisations to put on exhibitions and events with a focus on science, technology, learning and community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,526,169
Donations and legacies | £59.08k | |
Charitable activities | £282.13k | |
Other trading activities | £1.12m | |
Investments | £2.07m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£4,430,198
Raising funds | £2.24m | |
Charitable activities | £2.19m | |
Other | £4.96k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £841,615 from 3 government contract(s) and £4,715 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.24m | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.19m |
People

44 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
41 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 10 March 1999: Standard registration
- NORFOLK AND NORWICH MILLENNIUM COMPANY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN ANTHONY FRY | Chair | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Professor Catherine Teresa Richardson | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Cllr Claire Kidman | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Jeremy Laurence White | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Simon Ofield-Kerr | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David John Merrick | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Morphew | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JONATHAN BARNES | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH GUEST | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Maw | Trustee | 18 May 2009 |
|
|||||
CAROLINE JARROLD | Trustee | 19 January 2009 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.96m | £2.15m | £3.06m | £3.42m | £3.53m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.97m | £3.38m | £3.73m | £4.12m | £4.43m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £168.13k | £841.62k | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.00k | £104.18k | £284.87k | £71.49k | £4.72k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £29.84k | £105.18k | £289.72k | £74.49k | £59.08k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £979.46k | £376.69k | £836.21k | £1.09m | £1.12m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £285.57k | £21.35k | £156.04k | £239.11k | £282.13k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.66m | £1.41m | £1.72m | £2.02m | £2.07m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £246.45k | £54.99k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.72m | £2.38m | £2.14m | £2.20m | £2.19m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.25m | £993.38k | £1.59m | £1.92m | £2.24m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £102.91k | £117.56k | £106.13k | £102.83k | £106.01k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £747.04k | £0 | £1.17m | £1.65m | £1.57m | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £3.81k | £4.51k | £196 | £953 | £4.96k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £24.49m | £23.35m | £21.42m | £20.56m | £19.73m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £1.39m | £1.39m | £1.39m | |
|
Other assets | £4.80m | £4.88m | £5.29m | £5.44m | £5.57m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £814.59k | £970.42k | £1.01m | £1.00m | £1.21m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH NOVEMBER 1997, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 14TH DECEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR STUDY, LEARNING AND TRAINING BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A MILLENNIUM LIBRARY AND OTHER LIBRARIES AND OUTREACH FACILITIES, BY THE FURTHER DEVELOPMENT OF CHARITABLE SERVICES AND ACTIVITIES CARRIED OUT IN OR PROVIDED AT THE MILLENNIUM BUILDING BY THE CHARITY AND BY THE BUILDING'S OTHER OCCUPIERS AND BY THE PROMOTION AND DEVELOPMENT OF ART GALLERIES, MUSEUMS, ARCHAEOLOGICAL INVESTIGATIONS AND OTHER SIMILAR RESOURCES FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A MILLENNIUM BUILDING IN NORWICH WHICH SHALL INCLUDE: (1) THE MILLENNIUM LIBRARY REFERRED TO ABOVE (11) A LEARNING CENTRE PROVIDING TRAINING, ADVISORY AND INFORMATION SERVICES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NORWICH, NORFOLK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (111) A HERITAGE ATTRACTION PRESENTING THE HISTORY OF NORWICH, NORFOLK AND THE REGION INCORPORATED WITH A TOURIST INFORMATION CENTRE INTO A VISITOR CENTRE (IV) A MULTI MEDIA AUDITORIUM DESIGNED FOR EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING PURPOSES (V) INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY AND ELECTRONIC INFORMATION SERVICES, WHICH THE CHARITY MAY PROMOTE AND DEVELOP (B) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF NORFOLK AND NORWICH INCLUDING IN THE CONTEXT OF THE MILLENNIUM BUILDING: (1) A COVERED FORUM OR CIVIC MEETING PLACE (11) AN EXTERNAL PUBLIC SQUARE (C) ANY OTHER SIMILAR CHARITABLE OBJECTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF NORFOLK AND NORWICH AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NORWICH, NORFOLK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE FORUM TRUST LTD
THE FORUM
MILLENNIUM PLAIN
NORWICH
NR2 1TF
- Phone:
- 01603 727950
- Email:
- info@theforumnorwich.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window