Accounts and annual returns THE UNIVERSITY OF WINCHESTER

Charity number: 307254
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2005 20 June 2006 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2005 30 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2004 31 May 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2004 23 December 2004 On Time