Trustees TAVERHAM RECREATIONAL FACILITIES LTD

Charity Number: 1062217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joby Mason Castlo-Hall Chair 21 November 2019
None on record
John Richard Baker Trustee 07 March 2024
None on record
Adrian Stephen Marr Trustee 21 April 2022
None on record
Carolyn Mary Duthie Trustee 21 April 2022
None on record
MATTHEW BRINE Trustee 19 April 2013
None on record
MRS JACKIE GLENN Trustee 08 September 2008
None on record