Accounts and annual returns ROBERT WALTER WHITTINGTON MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity Number: 307291
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2006 29 December 2006 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2004 28 July 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2004 Not Required