ALLEN AND CURTIS MUSEUM FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support to museums services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 24 April 1969: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hampshire County Council | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.41k | £2.77k | £3.04k | £3.39k | £3.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £3.41k | £5.81k | £3.39k | £3.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 April 2024 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 31ST JANUARY 1969
Charitable objects
1. THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE, FOR EXHIBITION TO THE PUBLIC IN THE URBAN DISTRICT OF ALTON AND ELSEWHERE IN HAMPSHIRE, OF A COLLECTION OF PICTURES AND OTHER WORKS OF ART AND OF OBJECTS SUITABLE FOR EXHIBITION IN A MUSEUM OR ART GALLERY. 2. THE EXTENSION AND ENHANCEMENT, CONSERVATIONC STORAGE AND MAINTENANCE OF THE COLLECTION. 3. THE PROMOTION OF THE APPRECIATION OR ART AND OF EDUCATION IN ART AND ALLIED SUBJECTS, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO PICTURES, WORKS OF ART AND OTHER OBJECTS INCLUDED IN THE COLLECTION.
Area of benefit
URBAN DISTRICT OF ALTON AND ELSEWHERE IN HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAMPSHIRE COUNTY COUNCIL
THE CASTLE
CASTLE AVENUE
WINCHESTER
SO23 8UJ
- Phone:
- 01962841841
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window