RISING SUN ARTS CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Participatory arts activities especially with vulnerable and excluded people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £5,544 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Reading
Governance
- 03 June 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Doon Laura Lovett | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joss Adams | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Richard Foulkes | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lina Maria Sofia Johansson | Trustee | 25 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.46k | £47.69k | £49.69k | £79.54k | £69.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.14k | £50.72k | £50.32k | £73.42k | £73.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.50k | £4.10k | £36.02k | N/A | £5.54k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 13 September 2024 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 01 March 2024 | 367 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 27 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 APRIL 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 APR 2016
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF READING WITHOUT DISTINCTION BY ASSOCIATING THEM TOGETHER WITH OTHERS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFEE
Area of benefit
READING
Contact information
- Address:
-
RISING SUN
26-30 SILVER STREET
READING
RG1 2ST
- Phone:
- 01189866788
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window