THE COSTELLO EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION IN CONNECTION WITH THE COSTELLO SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides support, in the form of grants, to The Costello School in Basingstoke, Hampshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 13 October 1971: Standard registration
- THE COSTELLO EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION IN CONNECTION WITH HARRIET COSTELLO SECONDARY SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Richard Christopher Conway | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Beth Victoria LINKLATER | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|||||
HILARY EMMA CLARK | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.12k | £1.10k | £896 | £853 | £786 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.10k | £1.00k | £0 | £1.00k | £8.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 08/09/1971 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 02/07/2013
Charitable objects
1. IN PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY, FOR THE COSTELLO SCHOOL, AN ACADEMY, AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED UPON BETWEEN THE TRUSTEES, THE GOVERNORS OF THE SAID SCHOOL AND THE AUTHORITY; 2. IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PUPILS ATTENDING THE SAID SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 WALLIS ROAD
BASINGSTOKE
RG21 3DN
- Phone:
- 01256322073
- Email:
- derekganthony@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window