CHELMSFORD ASSOCIATION OF VOLUNTARY CARE GROUPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides support to Community Care Groups in the City of Chelmsford
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 28 January 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TONY LIVERSEDGE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Roger Lionel Eves | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE SPRATT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.13k | £0 | £858 | £900 | £696 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.13k | £1.08k | £875 | £900 | £696 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/10/1996 AS AMENDED ON 19/10/2011
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND CARE OF PERSONS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS, AND THE RELIEF OF PERSONS CARING FOR THEM, BY: A. PROVIDING SHORT-TERM EMERGENCY HELP TO RESIDENTS IN ANY AREA OF CHELMSFORD BOROUGH AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS, WHICH IS NOT ALREADY COVERED BY A COMMUNITY CARE GROUP; B. WHERE POSSIBLE, SETTING UP AND SUPPORTING COMMUNITY CARE GROUPS IN ALL AREAS OF CHELMSFORD AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS, TO PROVIDE RESIDENTS WITH SHORT-TERM EMERGENCY HELP; C. DISSEMINATING INFORMATION; ARRANGING INSURANCE; PROVIDING ADVICE AND TRAINING; LIAISING WITH COUNTY BOROUGH AND HEALTH AUTHORITIES IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES TO RESIDENTS AFFECTED BY SOCIAL AND HEALTH PROBLEMS; AND MAINTAINING A REGISTER OF CO-ORDINATORS OF THE AFOREMENTIONED COMMUNITY CARE GROUPS.
Area of benefit
CHELMSFORD DISTRICT AND SURROUNDING BOROUGHS
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 BARNABY RUDGE
CHELMSFORD
CM1 4YG
- Phone:
- 01245442382
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window