THE TRAINING SHIP 'MERCURY' TRUST
Charity number: 307321
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 23 September 1963: Standard registration
- 16 February 1996: Removed
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 6 AUGUST 1909 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 26 JUNE 1972
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) AND TO SECURE THE ADVANCEMENT OF LIFE OF BOYS AND YOUNG MEN WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED 19.2.1946
Charitable objects
SCHOLARSHIP TO BE AWARDED TO A) THE SON OF A NAVAL OR MERCANTILE MARINE OFFICER OR OF A CLERGYMAN OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OR OTHER GENTLEMAN WISHING TO BE TRAINED IN 'THE MERCURY' WITH THE VIEW OF ENTERING ROYAL NAVY OR MERCANTILE MARINE AND B) TO ANY BOY WHOSE PARENTS OR PARENT ARE OR IS IN REDUCED CIRCUMSTANCES AND WHO WISHES TO JOIN ROYAL NAVY AFTER TRAINING IN 'THE MERCURY'.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 23 September 1963 : Standard registration
- 16 February 1996 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.