Governing document ST NEOTS (EVERSLEY) LIMITED

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 SEPTEMBER 1955, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 22 JUNE 1994 AND 15 JUNE 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 SEP 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28 JUN 2021 as amended on 17 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
4 The charity’s objects (“Objects”) are specifically restricted to the education of boys or girls to give to such pupils general or specialised instruction of the highest class and to award scholarships and prizes to pupils or intending pupils and to support former pupils and others up to the age of 25 in connection with their attendance at further or higher education establishments.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.