STELLA TAYLOR YOUNG CHRISTIAN MUSICIANS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sponsors the musical training of young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 12 June 1997: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tatenda Chitsunge | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE SUSAN McCormick | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES HENRY STUART ADAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL DAGGETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN GURNEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAPTAIN MARC WILLIAM RICHMOND TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £609 | £507 | £533 | £564 | £560 | |
|
Total expenditure | £420 | £408 | £372 | £591 | £984 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 APRIL 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO YOUNG CHRISTIAN TO ENABLE THEM TO RECEIVE PROFESSIONAL LESSONS ON THE LEARNING OF ANY MUSIC INSTRUMENT USED IN THE CHURCH, PREFERABLY KEYBOARD, OR IN THE PURSUIT OF SINGING LESSONS OR CHORAL DIRECTION PROVIDED THEY INDICATE THEIR INTENTION OF USING SUCH TRAINING IN THE PRAISE OF OUR LORD.
Area of benefit
LEIGHTON BUZZARD, BEDFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 THE HEATH
LEIGHTON BUZZARD
LU7 3HL
- Phone:
- 01525373802
- Email:
- b.gurney@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window