Financial history BEXLEY WOMENS AID

Charity number: 1063427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £159.42k £156.89k £108.11k £183.45k £247.28k
Total expenditure £220.27k £229.11k £209.31k £194.11k £245.63k
Income from government contracts N/A £82.12k £30.34k £56.70k £87.55k
Income from government grants £62.86k N/A N/A £38.42k N/A