MIDLAND AND GREAT NORTHERN JOINT RAILWAY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1063676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A professional charitable organisation, adding historical value to the knowledge of the general public about the Midland and Great Northern Joint Railway and heritage railways in general, in a manner which is both educational and fun for the members and the general public.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 July 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • M&GN SOCIETY (Working name)
  • THE POPPY LINE TRUST (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin Robert Blee BFP ACA Chair 06 October 2021
None on record
David James Ballard Trustee 03 December 2022
None on record
Susan Denise Roberts Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
GRAEME WIGGLESWORTH Trustee 19 March 2016
None on record
KEITH ROLAND ASHFORD Trustee 28 January 2012
None on record
NIGEL ANTHONY SCARLETT Trustee 13 October 2001
None on record
TONY DEWEY Trustee 30 January 1999
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £1.32m £276.52k £321.36k £314.51k £581.00k
Total expenditure £226.97k £265.37k £169.58k £207.02k £449.95k
Income from government contracts £167 £65 £217 £0 £243
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.07m N/A N/A N/A £337.28k
Income - Other trading activities £50.52k N/A N/A N/A £10.90k
Income - Charitable activities £188.46k N/A N/A N/A £186.63k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £11.12k N/A N/A N/A £46.19k
Income - Other £1.56k N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £1.01m N/A N/A N/A £298.38k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £189.85k N/A N/A N/A £437.81k
Expenditure - Raising funds £37.12k N/A N/A N/A £12.15k
Expenditure - Governance £8.85k N/A N/A N/A £24.08k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A £13.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A £5.06k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Own use assets £825.54k N/A N/A N/A £919.78k
Long-term investments £1.20m N/A N/A N/A £1.22m
Other assets £870.79k N/A N/A N/A £1.27m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities £7.56k N/A N/A N/A £119.30k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 29 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 29 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 29 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 29 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 29 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 29 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 22 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 22 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 17 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 17 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SHERINGHAM STATION
STATION APPROACH
SHERINGHAM
NORFOLK
NR26 8RA
Phone:
07818 577212