FRANK ROBERT HOLDEN WILLTRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial support to parochial church councils
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 17 April 1998: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NATHAN MARK BOWLES | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
JONATHAN CHARLES GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
Michael Griffiths | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.62k | £1.62k | £1.76k | £2.21k | £1.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.62k | £1.62k | £1.68k | £1.68k | £1.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED P.R. AT BRIGHTON 1ST JUNE 1995
Charitable objects
(A) ONE HALF OF THE INCOME TO THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST. MARY WOODNESBOROUGH IN THE DIOCESE OF CANTERBURY FOR THE COUNCIL'S GENERAL ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES BUT ONLY FOR SO LONG AS (IN THE OPINION OF THE EXECUTORS) REGULAR SERVICES ARE HELD IN THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MARY WOODNESBOROUGH AND SUBJECT THERETO THE EXECUTORS SHALL HOLD THE SAME FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THEY SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE. (B) ONE QUARTER OF THE YEARLY INCOME TO THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST JAMES STAPLE IN THE SAME DIOCESE FOR THE COUNCIL'S GENERAL ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES BUT ONLY FOR SO LONG AS (IN THE OPINION OF THE EXECUTORS) REGULAR SERVICES ARE HELD IN THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST. JAMES STAPLE AND SUBJECT THERETO THE EXECUTORS SHALL HOLD THE SAME FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THEY SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE. (C) ONE QUARTER OF THE YEARLY INCOME THEREOF TO THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL ODF ST. PETER AND ST. PAUL WORTH IN THE SAME DIOCESE FOR THE COUNCIL'S GENERAL ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES BUT ONLY FOR SO LONG AS (IN THE OPINION OF THE EXECUTORS) REGULAR SERVICES ARE HELD IN THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL WORTH AND SUBJECT THERETO THE EXECUTORS SHALL HOLD THE SAME FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THEY SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
STAPLE, WOODNESBOROUGH, WORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
12-14 QUEEN STREET
DEAL
KENT
CT14 6EU
- Phone:
- 01304373154
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window