Accounts and annual returns DRAYTON MANOR TRUST

Charity Number: 307344
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 21 August 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 02 May 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 16 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2015 18 November 2016 171 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 Not Required