HERITAGE HOUSE CARING GROUP ( WELLS-NEXT-THE-SEA ) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Day care centre for the elderly and disabled.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £56,493 from 1 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
46 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 30 April 1997: Standard registration
- HERITAGE HOUSE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrianne Granville | Chair | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Percival Hargreaves | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Ann Bidwell | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Pattrick | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Noy | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Peter Garnett | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Andrew Llewelyn | Trustee | 24 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally Whitworth | Trustee | 22 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200.46k | £250.59k | £289.39k | £244.73k | £469.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £278.44k | £244.07k | £263.68k | £291.65k | £308.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £49.94k | N/A | £52.76k | N/A | £56.49k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £81.87k | £56.78k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 14 JANUARY 1997.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PERSONS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED WHETHER FINANCIALLY OR OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heritage House
Mill Road
WELLS-NEXT-THE-SEA
NR23 1RF
- Phone:
- 01328711333
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window