FLITCHAM VILLAGE HALL AND COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust exists to provide village hall amenities for the use of the inhabitants of the Parish of Flitcham cum Appleton in the County of Norfolk and the surrounding area including use for meetings lectures and classes and for other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Norfolk
Governance
- 14 March 1997: Standard registration
- THE BELL COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Farrow | Chair | 12 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Joey Smithson | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lee Miller | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
COLIN LUKEY | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hunter | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES SARAH STANTON | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.32k | £14.99k | £19.13k | £4.66k | £5.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.98k | £5.82k | £10.31k | £8.84k | £10.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £230 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.71k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 September 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 October 2021 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 16 DECEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF FLITCHAM CUM APPLETON IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF FLITCHAM CUM APPLETON IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Church Road
Flitcham
King's Lynn
PE31 6BU
- Phone:
- 01485609025
- Email:
- andrew_jarvis2@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window