CARERS TRUST BUCKS AND MILTON KEYNES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports carers throughout Buckinghamshire through support groups, telephone advice, information and training and disbursement of bursary grants. The Charity also runs specialist support groups for parent carers, young carers, male carers and mental health. There is a young carers support team.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,001,221
Donations and legacies | £50.30k | |
Charitable activities | £950.92k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£958,682
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £958.68k | |
Other | £0 |
£104,316 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £820,919 from 1 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £958.68k | |
Retained for future use | £42.54k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £958.68k | |
Retained for future use | £146.85k |
People

27 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- AYLESBURY VALE CARERS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- CARERS BUCKS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Lowndes | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|||
Nicola Lauris Jacobs | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|||
Dr Jitka Vseteckova | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|||
Mark Willis | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|||
STEWART GEORGE | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|||
Dr LESLIE DAVIES | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
|||
MR MIKE ROWLANDS | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.01m | £1.06m | £1.07m | £1.03m | £1.00m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.05m | £980.87k | £989.22k | £984.03k | £958.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £887.53k | £820.92k | £820.92k | £820.92k | £820.92k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.15k | £117.27k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £53.34k | £55.29k | £40.42k | £59.53k | £50.30k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £55.26k | £22.52k | £16.65k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £905.90k | £985.84k | £1.01m | £971.39k | £950.92k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £57.88k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £272 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £30.68k | £28.35k | £28.36k | £29.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.05m | £979.58k | £988.76k | £983.36k | £958.68k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £943 | £1.29k | £462 | £672 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £8.76k | £0 | £9.15k | £9.55k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £26.91k | £15.24k | £7.62k | £193 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.08m | £1.32m | £1.38m | £1.31m | £1.42m | |
|
Other assets | £302.66k | £585.91k | £630.16k | £549.07k | £517.82k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £183.40k | £372.18k | £328.23k | £192.84k | £118.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH A DISABILITY ARISING FROM AGE, SICKNESS OR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITY WHO ARE DEPENDENT ON OTHERS FOR THEIR CARE BY THE PROVISION OF PRACTICAL HELP, ADVICE, ASSISTANCE, SERVICE, SUPPORT, ADVOCACY AND INFORMATION TO SPOUSES, PARTNERS, RELATIVES AND OTHERS WHO HAVE OR ASSUME AN UNPAID RESPONSIBILITY FOR THEIR CARE AND TREATMENT (THE CARERS) 2 TO PROMOTE THE INTERESTS OF THE CARERS DEFINED IN CLAUSE 3.1 INCLUDING THE RELIEF OF HARDSHIP AND MENTAL OR PHYSICAL SICKNESS AMONGST THE CARERS 3 TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION CONCERNING THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF THOSE REQUIRING SUCH CARE AND TREATMENT AND THEIR CARERS 4 TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE "SOCIALLY EXCLUDED" MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL).
Area of benefit
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Linked charities
- 22 November 2006 : Standard registration
- 26 June 2007 : Removed
- 26 June 2007 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
Carers Bucks
Ardenham Court
Oxford Road
AYLESBURY
Buckinghamshire
HP19 8HT
- Phone:
- 01296392711
- Email:
- mail@carersbucks.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window