STRANGE CARGO ARTS COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Strange Cargo is a multi discipline arts company whose core values of access, participation and excellence support a diverse programme of unique projects with social engagement and community development as integral elements. The four main areas of work include award winning public art, gallery projects, training and education projects, and celebratory work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £47,264 from 18 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kent
Governance
- 02 March 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Josephine Mary Carter | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Anne Hough | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Terry Perk | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Joseph CHARLESWORTH | Trustee | 27 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR NICK VARIAN | Trustee | 27 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER THATCHER | Trustee | 27 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
GARY BOURNE | Trustee | 21 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £231.59k | £179.70k | £155.72k | £135.06k | £190.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £249.57k | £115.30k | £131.47k | £163.60k | £169.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £142.57k | £83.23k | £132.11k | £110.97k | £47.26k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 9 JUNE 1995
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PERSONS RESIDING IN EAST KENT AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE COMMUNITY RESIDING IN EAST KENT AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN THE APPRECIATION AND PRACTICE OF THE ARTS
Area of benefit
EAST KENT AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Strange Cargo Arts Co Ltd
The Factory
43 Geraldine Road
FOLKESTONE
CT19 4BD
- Phone:
- 01303278821
- Email:
- info@strangecargo.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window