THE BC GROUP TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Heritage site management - natural landscaping. Countryside, habitat & wildlife management. Land, property, (not buildings) & woodlands management.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2017
Total income includes £2,000 from government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 April 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STUART TAYLOR | Trustee | 06 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY DAVID BLACKFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE ANN BLACKFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICK DRANE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2013 | 28/02/2014 | 28/02/2015 | 29/02/2016 | 28/02/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.56k | £30.10k | £25.02k | £8.83k | £18.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.85k | £18.32k | £24.01k | £8.30k | £17.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £2.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.16k | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 133 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 133 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 500 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 500 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 865 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 865 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1230 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1230 days | |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1594 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1594 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 1ST OCTOBER 1996, AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 1ST MARCH 1997
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION, RESTORATION, MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE AESTHETIC APPEARANCE OF THE RURAL LANDSCAPE, IN PARTICULAR, PUBLIC ACCESS SITES, AGRICULTURAL LAND AND WOODLAND. TO PROVIDE AND FOSTER THE PROVISION BY OTHERS OF NATURAL HABITATS WITHIN WORKING FARMS, PUBLIC ACCESS SITES AND WOODLAND, IN WHICH THE WILDEST POSSIBLE VARIETY OF WILD ANIMAL, BIRD AND FLORA MAY FLOURISH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
EVERGREENS
BRINKLEY
NEWMARKET
SUFFOLK
CB8 0SQ
- Phone:
- 01638507390
- Email:
- GB@THEBCGROUPTRUST.CO.UK
- Website:
-
TheBCGroup.Trust
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window