HEMEL HEMPSTEAD ROUND TABLE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 07 October 1998: Standard registration
- 27 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6TH AUGUST 1998
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN FURTHERANCE OF AN EVENT OR EVENTS ORGANISED BY THE CLUB FOR THE PURPOSE OF RAISING FUNDS FOR SUCH PURPOSES FOR DISTRIBUTION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AND OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE BODIES, TRUST ASSOCIATIONS, INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS AFORESAID AND IN SUCH SHARES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE CLUB IN ORDINARY MEETING SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE OR SELECT. THE CLUB SHALL COMMUNICATE SUCH DETERMINATION OR SELECTION TO THE TRUSTEES IN WRITING.
Area of benefit
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window