BROMLEY COMMUNITY MEDIATION SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of mediation services in order to resolve: - Neighbour disputes - Conflict within local communities - Conflict within families - Conflict between individuals and businesses - Dysfunctional relationships at work and in local community organisations Provision of advocacy services to assist individuals in dealing with authorities and institutions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bexley
- Bromley
- Greenwich
- Kent
Governance
- 17 March 1997: Standard registration
- 20 December 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BROMLEY NEIGHBOUR MEDIATION SERVICE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.23k | £7.19k | £6.94k | £3.78k | £7.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.75k | £4.44k | £8.25k | £6.75k | £10.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 21 June 2017 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26TH NOVEMBER 1996 AND AMENDED 20 OCTOBER 1999 AND 1ST NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PREDOMINATELY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN THE LOCAL AREA OR COMMUNITY OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY, AND WITH A VIEW TO THE PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC ORDER, AND PROVISION OF SERVICES DIRECTED TOWARDS MEDIATION, CONCILIATION OR RECONCILIATION AS BETWEEN PERSONS, ORGANISATIONS, AUTHORITIES OR GROUPS INVOLVED OR LIKELY TO BECOME INVOLVED IN DISPUTE OR INTER-PERSONAL CONFLICT BOTH GENERALLY AND, IN PARTICULAR, IN ANY SITUATION WHERE THAT DISPUTE OR CONFLICT RESULTS FROM OR MAY LEAD TO ACTS OF VIOLENCE, NUISANCE, VANDALISM, RACIAL ABUSE, UNLAWFUL ACTIVITY OR BREAKDOWN OF PUBLIC ORDER. (B) TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY IN THE SAID LOCAL AREA OR COMMUNITY OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY, IN THE PURPOSES AND METHODS OF SUCH MEDIATION, CONCILIATION OR RECONCILIATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE UNDERSTANDING OF THE NATURE AND CAUSES OF ANY SUCH DISPUTES OR CONFLICTS AND OF ALL MEANS OF MANAGING THEM FOR PURPOSES OF PEACEFUL RESOLUTION IN THE INTERESTS OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window