KIRTLING VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To improve and benefit the life of inhabitants of the rural community of the Parish of Kirtling and Upend by enabling meetings, fetes, lectures, classes and for other forms of recreation and leisure-time pursuits etc. to take place
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 28 April 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW KITELEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Margaret Mary Short | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Vause | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Dennis | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cecilia Ann Bailey | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Kiteley | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.35k | £611 | £6.65k | £8.34k | £7.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.24k | £6.72k | £14.65k | £12.48k | £12.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 May 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE EXECUTED ON 7 APRIL 1925. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07 AUG 2017 as amended on 18 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AT LARGE OF THE PARISH OF KIRTLING AND UPEND.
Area of benefit
KIRTLING AND UPEND, IN EAST CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chestnut Cottage
Upend
Newmarket
Suffolk
CB8 9PH
- Phone:
- 01638730659
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window