CARERS SUPPORT SPELTHORNE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Carers Support Spelthorne - CSS - has ceased to provide services to carers in Spelthorne following the withdrawal of core funding by Surrey County Council. CSS supported carers in confidence providing a listening ear, advocacy, training and information. It represented them on both statutory and voluntary agencies promoting a greater understanding of their needs to the professional community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 21 March 1997: Standard registration
- 18 January 2023: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 18 January 2023: Funds transferred to 1116714 ACTION FOR CARERS (SURREY)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.74k | £19 | £600 | £69 | £9 | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.68k | £736 | £500 | £20.00k | £21.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £108.11k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 28 February 2020 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH JANUARY 1997
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN THE BOROUGH OF SPELTHORNE WHO ARE AGED, DISABLED, ILL, INFIRM, OR WHO ARE OTHERWISE IN NEED OF CARE BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND OTHER ASSISTANCE FOR THE CARERS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF SPELTHORNE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window