BILLING BROOK SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SPECIAL SCHOOL - FUND RAISING THROUGH TUCK SHOP/SCHOOL TRIPS/SCHOOL UNIFORM/SUPPORTING OTHER CHARITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 14 March 1997: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 03 December 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Lewis | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Lister | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.90k | £8.49k | £482 | £1.31k | £4.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 June 2024 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2022 | 359 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2022 | 359 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED NOVEMBER 28 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF BILLING BROOK SCHOOL, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY. IN FURTHERANCE (BUT NOT FURTHER), THE FUND MAY UNDERTAKE ACTIVITIES WHICH PROMOTE THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SCHOOL AND FURTHER THE EDUCATION AND ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NORTHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
BILLING BROOK SCHOOL
PENISTONE ROAD
NORTHAMPTON
NN3 8EZ
- Phone:
- 01604773910
- Email:
- traceycarter@bbrook.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window