AGE UK HOUNSLOW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS ARE TO "PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HOUNSLOW REGARDLESS OF ETHNIC ORIGIN, GENDER, MARITAL STATUS, DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGIOUS BELIEF."
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £177,180 from 12 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
153 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hounslow
Governance
- AGE CONCERN HOUNSLOW (Previous name)
- AGE CONCERN HOUNSLOW BOROUGH (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vinal Karania | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Reynolds | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Segal KC | Trustee | 30 March 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £374.55k | £369.38k | £344.38k | £355.01k | £396.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £492.39k | £352.00k | £238.72k | £333.36k | £449.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £92.40k | £83.79k | £151.13k | £136.35k | £177.18k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/03/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/10/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29/05/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN AND AROUND HOUNSLOW
Area of benefit
IN AND AROUND HOUNSLOW
Contact information
- Address:
-
AGE UK HOUNSLOW
Southville Community Centre
Southville Road
Feltham
TW14 8AP
- Phone:
- 02085606969
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window