Financial history NORTH ILFORD ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity number: 1062761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £156.57k £118.06k £227.93k £352.32k £378.69k
Total expenditure £117.22k £132.30k £116.53k £203.30k £169.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.24k N/A N/A N/A