NORTH ILFORD ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
North Ilford Islamic Centre is a non-governmental and non-political organisation. The objectives are to establish a Centre for the benefit of Muslims, to advance Islam and advance education generally and to provide or assist in the provision of facilities for recreation or leisure time occupation for the inhabitants of North Ilford and the surrounding area in the interest of social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 09 June 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMAD ASHRAF | Chair | 28 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Kashem Ali | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Dawood Khan | Trustee | 02 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL MOHAMMAD PATEL | Trustee | 28 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
ISMAIL CASSIM PAREKH | Trustee | 28 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHERSHAD GUL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMIN WARIND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAN MOHAMMED GUL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £156.57k | £118.06k | £227.93k | £352.32k | £378.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.22k | £132.30k | £116.53k | £203.30k | £169.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 February 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 February 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 6 MAY 1997
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF MUSLIMS TO ADVANCE ISLAM AND ADVANCE EDUCATION GENERALLY AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF NORTH ILFORD [AND SURROUNDING AREAS] IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
NORTH ILFORD, ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
97 KENSINGTON GARDENS
ILFORD
IG1 3EN
- Phone:
- 07951117660
- Email:
- MASHRAF@MY-NURSERY.ORG
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window