Financial history HAILSHAM PAVILION LIMITED

Charity number: 1062538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £266.79k £120.59k £209.26k £223.78k £236.09k
Total expenditure £254.36k £160.50k £180.40k £244.04k £246.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £39.30k £35.99k £6.67k N/A