BUNGAY ARTS AND THEATRE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides and assist in the provision of facilities for the recreational, educational, cultural, artistic and other leisure occupations in the interests of the social welfare of the inhabitants of the town of Bungay and surrounding communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 14 May 1997: Standard registration
- BATS (Working name)
- THE FISHER THEATRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Charles Yaxley | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|||||||
Nigel Clifford Lubbock | Trustee | 13 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Darren Ashley France | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Nicholas John Usherwood | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Baker | Trustee | 20 November 2016 |
|
|||||||
Peter Roy Holmes | Trustee | 21 February 2016 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN MICHAEL PUTMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SANDRA COX | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £573.95k | £234.21k | £124.70k | £218.61k | £240.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £238.23k | £130.75k | £191.89k | £260.33k | £270.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.50k | £211.55k | £16.52k | £5.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £362.16k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £51.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £160.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £13 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £145.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £92.77k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6TH FEBRUARY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATIONAL, EDUCATIONAL, CULTURAL, ARTISTIC OR OTHER LEISURE OCCUPATIONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE TOWN OF BUNGAY AND SURROUNDING COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
BUNGAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROES FARM
NORWICH ROAD
WOODTON
BUNGAY
NR35 2LP
- Phone:
- 01508482210
- Email:
- info@fishertheatre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window