BRAINS MATTER CHARITY

Charity number: 1062884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Brains Matter works throughout West Kent. It supports people who have sustained an acquired brain injury and their families and carers. It offers a day service and community support providing social rehabilitation and respite for people aged 18 years and over, who have moderate to severe brain injury.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £215,956
Total expenditure: £242,029

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 June 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HEADWAY IN WEST KENT (Previous name)
  • HEADWAY TUNBRIDGE WELLS AND DISTRICT (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanna Mary Clark-Wilson Chair 21 March 2019
None on record
Paul Francis Lester Trustee 07 March 2024
None on record
John Kennedy Trustee 15 November 2021
None on record
Edward Fardell Trustee 12 June 2020
None on record
Jacqueline Leeann Barker Trustee 12 August 2019
None on record
Erika Jane Johnson Trustee 08 July 2019
None on record
Susan Pearce Trustee 02 April 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £223.27k £109.96k £89.90k £107.56k £215.96k
Total expenditure £191.82k £170.32k £204.20k £203.05k £242.03k
Income from government contracts N/A £44.95k £67.49k £15.00k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 04 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 CULVERDEN PARK
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
TN4 9QT
Phone:
01892619001